EP0058291 - Chain saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mafell-Maschinenfabrik Rudolf Mey KG Postfach 21 D-7238 Oberndorf a.N. 4 Aistaig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | For all designated states MAFELL-Maschinenfabrik Rudolf Mey KG Postfach 21 D-7238 Oberndorf a.N. 4 Aistaig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinzelmann, Werner Felbenstrasse 3 D-7238 Oberndorf / DE | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Berthold, et al Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100076.7 | 08.01.1982 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | DE19813105416 | 14.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3105416 | [1982/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0058291 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0058291 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B27G19/00, B27B17/00 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
B27B17/0058 (EP);
B27G19/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, SE [1982/34] | Title | German: | Kettensäge | [1982/34] | English: | Chain saw | [1982/34] | French: | Scie à chaîne | [1982/34] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 08.08.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/13] | 05.09.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.06.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2937673 [ ] (DUPERRON LEO J, et al); | US3059673 [ ] (ARNOLD WOLESLAGLE); | FR1384843 [ ] (TROMECA); | US3230987 [ ] (ARNOLD WOLESLAGLE); | DE2056209 [ ]; | DE2134629 [ ] (BAEDORF JOHANN); | DE2849992 [ ] (JACKSON E L); | FR2440818 [ ] (LACOUR ROGER); | US4257162 [ ] (PARDON JOHN T); | FR2493750 [ ] (THIEBAUT PIERRE [FR]) |