EP0084066 - Process for removing lacquers and varnishes from metals or alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.1984 [1984/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben Rais, Abdelfettah Dr. 90 Allée des Baladins F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [1983/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/30] | Application number, filing date | 82100208.6 | 14.01.1982 | [1983/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084066 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084066 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00, B08B3/12 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C09D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL, SE [1983/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfernen von Lacken und Firnissen von Metallen oder Legierungen | [1983/30] | English: | Process for removing lacquers and varnishes from metals or alloys | [1983/30] | French: | Procédé de délaquage et de dévernissage des métaux et alliages | [1983/30] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/43] | 11.05.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2493752 ; | [X]FR1387249 ; | [Y]US3527607 |