EP0056618 - Process for preparing compounds that contain carboxyamide groups, especially peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wissmann, Hans, Dr. Falkenstrasse 12 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Kleiner, Hans-Jerg, Dr. Altkönigstrasse 11a D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [1982/30] | Application number, filing date | 82100218.5 | 14.01.1982 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | DE19813101427 | 17.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3101427 | [1982/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056618 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056618 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/08, C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/10 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
C07K5/06156 (EP,US);
C07K1/082 (EP,US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/30] | C07C103/52, C07C102/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäureamidgruppen enthaltenden Verbindungen, insbesondere von Peptiden | [1982/30] | English: | Process for preparing compounds that contain carboxyamide groups, especially peptides | [1982/30] | French: | Procédé de préparation de composés contenant des groupes carboxyamides, en particulier des peptides | [1982/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 21.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0014834 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, no. 40, 1976 A.G. JACKSON et al: "Activation of Carboxylic Acids as Diphenylphosphinic mixed Anhydrides: Application to Peptide Chemistry" Seiten 3627-30 |