EP0052094 - N-isopropoxycarbonylphenylglycines and their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOCHEMIE Gesellschaft m.b.H. 6250 Kundl Tirol / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states BIOCHEMIE Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-6250 Kundl Tirol / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ascher, Gerd, Dr. A-6250 Kundl 506 / AT | 02 /
Riedl, Kurt, Dr. Deceased Deceased / AT | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Streitzig, Heinz, et al SANDOZ AG Patentabteilung CH-4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Streitzig, Heinz, Dr., et al SANDOZ AG Patentabteilung CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 82100234.2 | 17.04.1980 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | AT19790003089 | 25.04.1979 Original published format: AT 308979 | AT19790005852 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: AT 585279 | AT19790005851 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: AT 585179 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052094 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C125/065 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
C07D499/00 (EP,US);
C07C271/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | N-Isopropoxycarbonylphenylglycine und ihre Herstellung | [1982/20] | English: | N-isopropoxycarbonylphenylglycines and their production | [1982/20] | French: | N-isopropoxycarbonylphénylglycines et leur production | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 01.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1985/50] | 01.07.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80102055.3 / EP0018546 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3970651 [ ] (KAPLAN MURRAY ARTHUR, et al) |