EP0084073 - Mounting frame for a light and fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/30] | Headlight mounting device and plastics vibration damping spacer | ||
[1986/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Lothar Rheinauer Ring 70 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Becker, Siegfried D.-Bonhoefferstrasse 3 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Effenberger, Hans Schwetzinger Platz D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Gradmann, Gerhard Eichenstrasse 2 D-6834 Ketsch / DE | 05 /
Keller, Manfred Jahnstrasse 15 D-6901 Dossenheim / DE | 06 /
Schäfer, Ulrich Rappenhof D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1986/13] |
Former [1983/30] | Schnabel, Hartmut, Dr.-Ing. Am Feldrain 13 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100329.0 | 19.01.1982 | [1983/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084073 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084073 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/04 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/39] |
Former [1983/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Halterahmen für eine Leuchte und Verbindungselement | [1983/30] | English: | Mounting frame for a light and fastening element | [1986/39] | French: | Collerette pour un luminaire et élément de fixation | [1986/39] |
Former [1983/30] | Headlight mounting device and plastics vibration damping spacer | ||
Former [1983/30] | Fenêtre de fixation pour phare et élément de liaison en matière élastique amortisseur de vibrations | Examination procedure | 16.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 15.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, LU, NL | 27.06.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1252093 ; | [A]GB2005818 (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE) | Examination | FR2341406 | GB2053990 |