EP0059830 - Apparatus for controlling the temperature in the rooms of a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/37] | Apparatus for controlling the environment in the rooms of a building | ||
[1985/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josef Gartner & Co. Postfach 20/40 D-89421 Gundelfingen / DE | [1982/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gartner, Karl Gartnersiedlung 8 D-8883 Gundelfingen / DE | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100357.1 | 19.01.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DE19813108355 | 05.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3108355 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059830 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059830 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/00, F24F7/04, F24F13/02, F24D5/10, F24D3/00 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
F24D5/10 (EP,US);
E04B2/96 (EP,US);
F24D3/1058 (EP,US);
F24F7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Temperieren von Räumen eines Gebäudes | [1982/37] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the temperature in the rooms of a building | [1985/20] | French: | Installation de temperisation de pièces de bâtiment | [1985/20] |
Former [1982/37] | Apparatus for controlling the environment in the rooms of a building | ||
Former [1982/37] | Installation de climatisation de pièces de bâtiment | Examination procedure | 07.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 08.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2546113 [ ] (FSL FENSTER SYSTEM LUEFTUNGS G); | DE2621186 [ ]; | DE2913598 [ ] (GARTNER & CO J); | DE2929159 [ ] (MENGERINGHAUSEN MAX) |