EP0057379 - Device for blowing a gather with a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.03.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen Gebrüder Scheubeck GmbH & Co. KG. Falkensteinstrasse 8 Postfach 120360 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen Gebrüder Scheubeck GmbH & Co. KG. Falkensteinstrasse 8 Postfach 120360 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fend, Fritz M. Thurmayerstrasse 11 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Koschorz, Reinhard Hauzensteiner Strasse 106 D-8413 Regenstauf / DE | [1982/32] | Application number, filing date | 82100399.3 | 21.01.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | DE19813103091 | 30.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3103091 | [1982/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057379 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/02, C03B9/08 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
C03B9/03 (EP);
C03B9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Blasen eines Külbels mittels einer Pfeife | [1982/32] | English: | Device for blowing a gather with a pipe | [1982/32] | French: | Dispositif à souffler une paraison utilisant une pipe | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/21] | 17.12.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0007997 [ ]; | FR713217 [ ]; | US3607204 [ ]; | AT9426B [ ] |