EP0058844 - Address generator for multiple virtual address spaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scalzi, Casper Anthony 160 Academy Street Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US | 02 /
Schmalz, Richard John 7 Edge Hill Drive Wappingers Falls New York 12590 / US | [1982/35] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1982/35] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82100716.8 | 02.02.1982 | [1982/35] | Priority number, date | US19810236387 | 20.02.1981 Original published format: US 236387 | [1982/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0058844 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0058844 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058844 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
G06F12/0292 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/35] | G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/35] | Title | German: | Adressgenerator für mehrfache virtuelle Adressbereiche | [1982/35] | English: | Address generator for multiple virtual address spaces | [1982/35] | French: | Générateur d'adresse pour espaces multiples d'adresse virtuelle | [1982/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4096573 (HELLER ANDREW ROBERT, et al); | [AD]US4050060 (BIRNEY RICHARD EUGENE, et al); | [A]US4084226 (ANDERSON LARRY DON, et al); | [AD]US4079453 (DAHL JAMES NORMAN); | [PD]EP0036085 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 10, no. 10, March 1968, pages 1531-1533, New York, US; J.M. COOMBS: "Flagging general register usage in supplemental indexing operations" | Examination | US3412382 |