EP0063675 - Device for putting board-like or bar-like stiffening members under packages and for banding them in a crosswise fashion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoesch Aktiengesellschaft Eberhardstrasse 12 44145 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | For all designated states Hoesch Aktiengesellschaft Eberhardstrasse 12 D-44145 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knieps, Horst Hilmar Schraberg 31 D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | [1982/44] | Application number, filing date | 82100993.3 | 11.02.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | DE19813115827 | 18.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3115827 | [1982/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063675 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063675 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/06, B65B13/18 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
B65B13/06 (EP);
B65B13/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum kreuzweisen Unterlegen und Umreifen von brett- oder balkenähnlichen Versteifungen unter Packstücken | [1982/44] | English: | Device for putting board-like or bar-like stiffening members under packages and for banding them in a crosswise fashion | [1982/44] | French: | Dispositif pour la mise de planches ou de poutres de raidissement en dessous de paquets et pour le cerclage de celles-ci en croix | [1982/44] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3494279 (SYLVESTER ROWLAND L, et al); | [A]FR2346222 (GERRARD IND LTD [GB]) |