EP0059856 - Flat card of thermoplastic material with visually readable security marks, and process for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orell Füssli Graphische Betriebe AG Dietzingerstrasse 3 8036 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states Orell Füssli Graphische Betriebe AG Dietzingerstrasse 3 CH-8003 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhl, Adolf Hubstrasse 13 a CH-8942 Oberrieden / CH | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1982/37] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. BLUM & CO. Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 82101115.2 | 16.02.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | CH19810001421 | 03.03.1981 Original published format: CH 142181 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059856 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059856 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/02 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
B42D25/425 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D2033/04 (EP);
B42D2033/08 (EP);
B42D2033/24 (EP);
B42D2033/30 (EP);
B42D2035/02 (EP);
B42D2035/16 (EP);
B42D2035/20 (EP);
B42D2035/30 (EP);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
Y10S283/904 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Ebene Karte aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff mit visuell wahrnehmbarem Sicherheitszeichen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1982/37] | English: | Flat card of thermoplastic material with visually readable security marks, and process for manufacturing the same | [1982/37] | French: | Carte plane en matière synthétique thermoplastique munie de signes de sécurité lisibles visuellement et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 05.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84114907.3 / EP0157921 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1171574 [ ] (LAMINATORS INC); | FR92448E [ ]; | US3412493 [ ] (FRENCH WALTER K); | DE1960563 [ ] (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | DE1939594 [ ] (RCA CORP); | US3604901 [ ] (MORITA TADAO, et al); | DE1771453 [ ] (MEIER MALETZ MAX); | DE2308876 [ ] (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG); | US3814904 [ ] (RUSSELL J, et al); | FR2279548 [ ] (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | DE2538956 [ ] (LANDIS & GYR AG); | FR2321158 [ ] (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]); | DE2603558 [ ] (ORELL FUESSLI GRAPH BETR AG [CH], et al); | DE2555214 [ ] (LANDIS & GYR AG); | FR2331451 [ ] (ORELL FUESSLI GRAPH BETR AG [CH]); | DE2659639 [ ] (GRETAG AG); | US4184700 [ ] (GREENAWAY DAVID L [CH]) | Examination | FR2176463 | FR2365657 |