EP0058916 - Electroconductive polyolefin resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/35] | Electroconductive resin composition | ||
[1986/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.1987 [1987/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Yoichi 1541, Yabe-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yoshiro 8-51, Takamatsu 2-chome Morioka Iwate-ken / JP | 03 /
Gotoh, Yoshihisa 2882, Iijima-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Maki, Masami 600-1, Kamisakunobe Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Yokote, Sachio 2882, Iijima-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Sekiguchi, Katsumi 6-20-1-122, Horikiri Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Sasagawa, Katsuyoshi 1541, Yabe-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Imai, Masao 4598-6, Seya-cho Seya-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/35] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101130.1 | 16.02.1982 | [1982/35] | Priority number, date | JP19810023147 | 20.02.1981 Original published format: JP 2314781 | JP19810028413 | 02.03.1981 Original published format: JP 2841381 | JP19810147972 | 21.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14797281 | JP19810177080 | 06.11.1981 Original published format: JP 17708081 | [1982/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058916 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058916 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/24, C08L23/02 | [1982/35] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08K13/02 (EP);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K13/02, C08L23/02 (EP);
C08K3/06, C08L23/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/35] | Title | German: | Elektrisch leitfähige Polyolefinkunststoff-Zusammensetzung | [1986/47] | English: | Electroconductive polyolefin resin composition | [1986/47] | French: | Composition de résine de polyoléfines conductrice de l'électricité | [1986/47] |
Former [1982/35] | Elektrisch leitfähige Kunststoffzusammensetzungen | ||
Former [1982/35] | Electroconductive resin composition | ||
Former [1982/35] | Composition de résine conductrice de l'électricité | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 06.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1354763 (MICHELIN & CIE); | [Y]US3702285 (KNORRE HELMUT, et al) | Examination | JPS5558236 |