EP0058932 - 4-Aryloxy-1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisoquinolines, and intermediates, a process for preparing the same, a pharmaceutical composition containing the same and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Effland, Richard Charles 544 Rolling Hills Road Bridgewater, N.J. 08807 / US | 02 /
Davis, Larry P.O. Box 129 Sergeantsville, N.J. 08557 / US | 03 /
Klein, Joseph Thomas P.O. Box 6576 Bridgewater, N.J. 08807 / US | [1982/35] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101170.7 | 17.02.1982 | [1982/35] | Priority number, date | US19810235801 | 19.02.1981 Original published format: US 235801 | [1982/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0058932 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0058932 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058932 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/24, A61K31/47 | [1982/35] | CPC: |
C07D217/24 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/35] | Title | German: | 4-Aryloxy-1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisochinoline und Zwischenprodukte, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung als Medikamente | [1982/35] | English: | 4-Aryloxy-1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisoquinolines, and intermediates, a process for preparing the same, a pharmaceutical composition containing the same and their use as medicaments | [1982/35] | French: | 4-Aryloxy-1,2,3,4-tétrahydroisoquinoléines et produits intermédiaires procédé pour leur préparation, composition pharmaceutique les contenant et leur utilisation en tant que médicaments | [1982/35] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/28] | 16.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54138572 ; | [A]DE2635276 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 2, 9 January 1980, page 122069; & JP-A-54 138 572, & JP54138572 A 19800109 |