EP0065621 - Fiber composite flywheel rim [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2230 East Imperial Highway El Segundo California 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2230 East Imperial Highway El Segundo California 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Donald Eugene 350 Siesta Avenue Thousand Oaks California 91360 / US | 02 /
Ingham, Kenneth Thomas 21531 Dumetz Road Woodland Hills California 91364 / US | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101237.4 | 18.02.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | US19810267323 | 26.05.1981 Original published format: US 267323 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065621 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065621 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16C15/00, F16F15/30 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
F16F15/305 (EP,US);
F16C15/00 (EP,US);
F16C2361/55 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/48] | Title | German: | Schwungradkranz aus Faserverbundwerkstoff | [1982/48] | English: | Fiber composite flywheel rim | [1982/48] | French: | Jante de volant en fibres composites | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 16.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.02.1986 | LI | 28.02.1986 | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/27] | GB | 18.02.1986 | |
CH | 28.02.1986 | ||
LI | 28.02.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | CH | 28.02.1986 | |
LI | 28.02.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE47209 ; | [A]DE24845 ; | [Y]AT61717B (PROCEDES WESTINGHOUSE LEBLANC); | [Y]FR506213 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]FR2359695 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4123949 (KNIGHT JR CHARLES E, et al); | [X]US4198878 (GUPTA BHAGWATI P [US], et al); | [X]US4207778 (HATCH BURTON D [US]); | [X]US4266442 (ZORZI EDWARD S) |