EP0059394 - Pneumatic transporting plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.1985 [1985/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states König, Gustav Stadtwaldstrasse 69 D-8052 Moosburg / DE | [1982/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/36] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/36] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101285.3 | 19.02.1982 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | DE19813107545 | 27.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3107545 | DE19813145017 | 12.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3145017 | [1982/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0059394 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0059394 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/40, B65G53/40, B65D90/62 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
B65G53/525 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/36] | B65G53/06, B65G53/40, B65D90/62 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/36] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Förderanlage | [1982/36] | English: | Pneumatic transporting plant | [1982/36] | French: | Installation de transport pneumatique | [1982/36] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 25.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 22.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/02] | 02.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |