EP0059875 - Gums tester with variable spring-load adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1985 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Karl Thomae GmbH Birkendorferstrasse 65 88397 Biberach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states Dr. Karl Thomae GmbH Birkendorferstrasse 65 D-88397 Biberach / DE | ||
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states Dr. Karl Thomae GmbH Postfach 1755 D-7950 Biberach (Riss) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwartz, Hans Am Hang 2 D-7951 Warthausen 1 / DE | 02 /
Steiner, Ferdinand Englertswiesen 5 D-7951 Hochdorf / DE | 03 /
Neumann, Günther Talfeldstrasse 53 D-7950 Biberach 1 / DE | 04 /
Papendick, Uwe, Dr. Richard-Wagner-Strasse 6 D-7951 Ummendorf / DE | [1982/37] | Application number, filing date | 82101357.0 | 23.02.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DE19813108661 | 07.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3108661 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0059875 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0059875 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059875 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/04 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
A61C19/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1982/37] | Title | German: | Gingivatest-Gerät mit variabler Feder-Last-Einstellung | [1982/37] | English: | Gums tester with variable spring-load adjustment | [1982/37] | French: | Appareil pour tester les gencives avec réglage variable de la charge par ressort | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 06.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD72109 ; | [AD]DE7821583U ; | [A]US4203223 (LAUTENSCHLAGER EUGENE P [US], et al); | [A]DE2452578 |