EP0059884 - Benzofurane derivatives, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Eberhard, Dr. verstorben / DE | 02 /
Lehmann, Manfred Lutherstrasse 13 1 Berlin 49 / DE | 03 /
Rufer, Clemens, Dr. Westhofener Weg 14 1 Berlin 38 / DE | 04 /
Böttcher, Irmgard, Dr. Frobenstrasse 46 CH-4000 Basel / CH | [1982/37] | Application number, filing date | 82101418.0 | 25.02.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DE19813110009 | 11.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3110009 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059884 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059884 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/79, C07D307/83, C07D307/87, C07D307/88, A61K31/34, A61K31/365 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C205/12 (EP,US);
C07C205/38 (EP,US);
C07C205/59 (EP,US);
C07D307/83 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Neue Benzofuran-Derivate, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1982/37] | English: | Benzofurane derivatives, their preparation and use | [1982/37] | French: | Dérivés du benzofuranne, leur préparation et leur usage | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 21.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2323005 (BOTTU SA); | [A]US3947587 (NEGREVERGNE GEORGES); | [A]FR2415461 (POUPELIN JEAN PIERRE [FR]) | Examination | EP0033614 |