EP0061031 - Steam generating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.06.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1987 | Opposition rejected | published on 29.07.1987 [1987/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | For all designated states Ticona Polymerwerke GmbH Postfach 13 20 D-6092 Kelsterbach / Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | ||
For all designated states Ticona Polymerwerke GmbH Postfach 13 20 D-6092 Kelsterbach / Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Aubachstrasse 55 D-6500 Mainz-Finten / DE | 02 /
Jung, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Jähne-Strasse 13 D-6093 Flörsheim-Wicker / DE | 03 /
Zapp, Reinhold Am Reinbornergrund la D-6273 Waldem 1 / DE | 04 /
Bär, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelm-Weberweg 4 D-6050 Offenbach a.M. / DE | 05 /
Mader, Herbert, Ing. grad. Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 24 D-6085 Nauheim / DE | [1982/39] | Application number, filing date | 82101632.6 | 03.03.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | DE19813110520 | 18.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3110520 | [1982/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061031 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061031 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F22B3/00 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
F22B3/045 (EP,US);
Y10S203/16 (EP,US);
Y10S203/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1982/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Dampf | [1982/39] | English: | Steam generating method | [1982/39] | French: | Procédé de production de vapeur | [1982/39] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1983 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 03.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.1985
12.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Wiesbaden Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [1985/23] | 13.06.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.07.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.02.1987 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.04.1987 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/31] | Appeal following opposition | 06.03.1986 | Appeal received No. T0086/86 | 03.02.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.1987 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE529464 [ ] (PHILIPP MUELLER G M B H); | EP0005825 [ ] (EGOSI DAN); | FR2448377 [ ] (LAGUILHARRE PIERRE [FR]); | DE3015736 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | EP0019297 [ ] (LINDE AG [DE]) |