EP0059945 - Document processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1984 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haftmann, Johannes Eggestrasse 44 D-4791 Dörenhagen / DE | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/37] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101699.5 | 04.03.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | DE19813108526 | 06.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3108526 | [1982/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059945 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059945 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/02, G06K7/08 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
G06K13/02 (EP);
G06K7/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/37] | Title | German: | Belegbearbeitungsvorrichtung | [1982/37] | English: | Document processing device | [1982/37] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de documents | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 08.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2507767 [ ] (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH); | US3866827 [ ] (OBATA ATSUSHI, et al); | US3976858 [ ] (HAUN MARION W); | US4040097 [ ] (MIZUNO MAMORU); | DE2952442 [ ] (CII HONEYWELL BULL) |