EP0061065 - Scroll type fluid displacement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1986 [1986/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | ||
Former [1982/39] | For all designated states SANKYO ELECTRIC COMPANY LIMITED 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraga, Masaharu 8-34, Honjo 4-chome Honjo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1982/39] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82101876.9 | 09.03.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | JP19810033645 | 09.03.1981 Original published format: JP 3364581 | [1982/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0061065 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0061065 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061065 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/02, F01C21/12 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
F01C1/0246 (EP,US);
F04C18/0207 (EP,US);
F04C2240/801 (EP,US);
F04C2250/102 (EP,US);
F05B2250/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/39] | Title | German: | Fluidumverdrängungsanlage mit Exzenterspiralelementen | [1982/39] | English: | Scroll type fluid displacement apparatus | [1982/39] | French: | Appareil à déplacement de fluide à volutes imbriquées | [1982/39] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 19.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3017045 (AGINFOR AG); | [A]GB220296 (LUIGI NORDI) | Examination | DE1233661 | DE13142 | AT106026B | CH600179 | FR2165159 | FR2329885 | US1755590 | US2049585 | US2129949 | US2404169 |