EP0088808 - Process for producing niobium Josephson junctions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Latta, Eberhard, Dr. Rütistrasse 66 CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | 02 /
Gasser, Marcel Tuschgenweg 83 CH-8041 Zürich / CH | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Schröder, Otto Heinrich Albrecht, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing., et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1983/38] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 82101971.8 | 12.03.1982 | [1983/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088808 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088808 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, H01L39/22 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
H10N60/0912 (EP,US);
Y10S505/922 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Josephson-Übergängen aus Niob | [1983/38] | English: | Process for producing niobium Josephson junctions | [1983/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de jonctions Josephson en niobium | [1983/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 01.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.11.1985 | [1999/42] |