EP0065086 - Rotating member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/47] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Robert-Koch-Strasse D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werner, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Friedenstrasse 6 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
Günther, Christian, Dr. Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 71 D-8013 Haar / DE | [1982/47] | Application number, filing date | 82101982.5 | 12.03.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | DE19813119500 | 15.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3119500 | DE19813143845 | 05.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3143845 | [1982/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065086 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60B5/02, B60B17/00, B60B3/08, F16C15/00 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
B60B3/08 (EP);
B29D99/0032 (EP);
B60B17/0003 (EP);
B60B23/10 (EP);
B60B25/002 (EP);
B60B3/005 (EP);
B60B3/007 (EP);
B60B3/044 (EP);
B60B3/047 (EP);
B60B3/12 (EP);
B60B3/16 (EP);
B60B5/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/47] | Title | German: | Drehbarer Körper | [1982/47] | English: | Rotating member | [1982/47] | French: | Corps rotatif | [1982/47] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 24.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/15] | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1380267 ; | [X]DE2411429 ; | [X]DE43128 ; | [X]US4200326 ; | [X]US3357747 ; | [X]US3369843 ; | [A]US3509614 ; | [A]CH219565 ; | [A]DE358471 ; | [A]FR2265555 ; | [A]AT229018B ; | [A]US3811737 |