EP0061642 - Casting or splinting package and method of constructing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1982/40] | For all designated states Cutter Laboratories, Inc. Fourth and Parker Streets Berkeley California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahlen, Burton L. 1534 London Circle Benicia California 94510 / US | 02 /
Odne, John L. 2133 Dover Court Walnut Creek California 94598 / US | 03 /
Ryan, John D. 78 McNear Drive San Rafael California 94901 / US | [1982/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1986/29] |
Former [1982/40] | Dill, Erwin, Dr., et al c/o BAYER AG Zentralbereich Patente Marken und Lizenzen Bayerwerk D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102076.5 | 15.03.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | US19810248610 | 27.03.1981 Original published format: US 248610 | [1982/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0061642 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0061642 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061642 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/04, A61F5/04, A61L15/07 | [1983/27] | CPC: |
A61L15/12 (EP,US);
A61F13/04 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/21] | A61F13/04, A61F13/04, A61L15/07 | ||
Former IPC [1982/40] | A61F5/04, A61F13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/40] | Title | German: | Umschlag zum Eingipsen oder Schienen und Verfahren zu seiner Ausführung | [1982/40] | English: | Casting or splinting package and method of constructing same | [1982/40] | French: | Bandage pour étirer ou consolider et son procédé de confection | [1982/40] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/40] | 24.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3630194 (BOARDMAN FRANKLIN); | [AD]DE2357931 (BAYER AG); | [XD]DE2651089 (BAYER AG); | [AD]US4231356 (USUKURA KOJI); | [A]US4235228 (GAYLORD JOHN F III [US], et al); | [X]WO8100671 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [E]EP0057988 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]) |