EP0061659 - Piperidine groups containing esters,methods for their preparation, their use as stabilising agents for polymers, and polymers containing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/40] | Macromolecular piperidine groups containing esters and urethanes, methods for their preparation, their use as stabilising agents for polymers, and polymers containing these compounds | ||
[1987/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiezer, Hartmut, Dr. Am Stocket 18 D-8901 Lützelburg / DE | 02 /
Pfahler, Gerhard, Dr. Karlsbader Strasse 27 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1982/40] | Application number, filing date | 82102193.8 | 18.03.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | DE19813111209 | 21.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3111209 | [1982/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061659 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061659 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C08K5/34, C08L23/12, // (C07D401/14, 251:04, 211:58) | [1982/40] | CPC: |
C08K5/34926 (EP,US);
C08G18/3842 (EP,US);
C08G63/6854 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/40] | Title | German: | Piperidingruppenhaltige Ester, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung als Stabilisatoren für Polymere sowie diese Verbindungen enthaltende Polymere | [1987/17] | English: | Piperidine groups containing esters,methods for their preparation, their use as stabilising agents for polymers, and polymers containing these compounds | [1987/17] | French: | Esters à groupement pipéridine, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme stabilisantes de polymère et polymères contenant ces composés | [1987/17] |
Former [1982/40] | Hochmolekulare piperidingruppenhaltige Ester und Urethane, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung als Stabilisatoren für Polymere sowie diese Verbindungen enthaltende Polymere | ||
Former [1982/40] | Macromolecular piperidine groups containing esters and urethanes, methods for their preparation, their use as stabilising agents for polymers, and polymers containing these compounds | ||
Former [1982/40] | Esters et uréthanes macromoléculaires à groupement pipéridine, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme stabilisantes de polymère et polymères contenant ces composés | Examination procedure | 26.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 11.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84105907.4 / EP0176604 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2319816 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | DE2422335 [ ] (ICI LTD); | DE2621870 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG, et al); | AT351269B [ ] (CHIMOSA CHIMICA ORGANICA SPA [IT]) | Examination | EP0003542 |