EP0069195 - Stabilized ethylene/chlorotrifluoroethylene copolymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ausimont, U.S.A., Inc. 44 Whippany Road CN 1838, Morristown, N.J. 07960 / US | [1987/20] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, Daniel Chuang-Jen 500 Rolling Hills Road Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
Chandrasekaran, Swayambu 60 Crane Road Mountain Lakes New Jersey 07046 / US | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/02] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102343.9 | 22.03.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | US19810280730 | 06.07.1981 Original published format: US 280730 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069195 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069195 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069195 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08K5/52 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
C08K5/526 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,US);
C08K5/52 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L23/08 (US,EP);
C08K5/098, C08L27/12 (US,EP);
C08K5/103, C08L23/08 (US,EP);
C08K5/103, C08L27/12 (US,EP);
C08K5/526, C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/526, C08L27/12 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1985/15] | C08L23/08, C08L27/12, C08K5/13, C08K5/52 | ||
Former IPC [1983/02] | C08L23/08, C08K5/52, C08K5/10, C08K5/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/02] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Äthylen/Chlorotrifluoräthylen Copolymer Zusammensetzung | [1983/02] | English: | Stabilized ethylene/chlorotrifluoroethylene copolymer composition | [1983/02] | French: | Composition stabilisée de copolymère éthylène/chlorotrifluoréthylène | [1983/02] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 16.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2179717 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]); | [YD]US3644482 (MARTIN DEXTER [US], et al) |