EP0062236 - Use of triazole derivatives for combating fungi [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/41] | Fungicidal agent containing triazole derivatives, and process for combating fungi therewith | ||
[1991/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rentzea, Costin, Dr. Neuenheimer Landstrasse 72 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Feuerherd, Karl-Heinz, Dr. c/o BASF Japan LTD. C.P.O. Box 1757 Tokyo 100-91 / JP | 03 /
Meyer, Norbert, Dr. Stahlbuehlring 155A D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | 04 /
Goetz, Norbert, Dr. Schoefferstrasse 25 D-6250 Worms / DE | 05 /
Pommer, Ernst-Heinrich, Dr. Berliner Platz 7 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1982/41] | Application number, filing date | 82102446.0 | 24.03.1982 | [1982/41] | Priority number, date | DE19813113628 | 04.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3113628 | [1982/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0062236 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0062236 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062236 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/06, A01N43/64, // C07D319/06 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D319/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/41] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Triazolylderivate zur Bekämpfung von Pilzen | [1991/36] | English: | Use of triazole derivatives for combating fungi | [1991/36] | French: | L'emploi des dérivés de triazole le lutte contre des champignons | [1991/36] |
Former [1982/41] | Fungizide Mittel, enthaltend Triazolylderivate und Verfahren zur Bekämpfung von Pilzen mit ihnen | ||
Former [1982/41] | Fungicidal agent containing triazole derivatives, and process for combating fungi therewith | ||
Former [1982/41] | Fongicide contenant des dérivés de triazole et procédé pour le lutte contre des champignons | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 21.03.1992 | AT | 24.03.1992 | GB | 24.03.1992 | SE | 25.03.1992 | BE | 31.03.1992 | CH | 31.03.1992 | LI | 31.03.1992 | LU | 31.03.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/25] | DE | 21.03.1992 | |
AT | 24.03.1992 | ||
GB | 24.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/46] | DE | 21.03.1992 | |
GB | 24.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | DE | 21.03.1992 | |
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | DE | 21.03.1992 | |
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | DE | 21.03.1992 | |
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | DE | 21.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2634511 (BASF AG); | [AP]EP0032239 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0043923 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0044407 (BASF AG [DE]) |