EP0062257 - Sulphur dyes, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1982/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornelius, Dieter, Dr. Grundstrasse 9 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1982/41] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102550.9 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/41] | Priority number, date | DE19813114033 | 07.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3114033 | [1982/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062257 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062257 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09B49/10, D06P1/30 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
C09B49/10 (EP,US);
Y10S8/918 (US);
Y10S8/924 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/41] | Title | German: | Schwefelfarbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/41] | English: | Sulphur dyes, process for their preparation and their use | [1982/41] | French: | Colorants de soufre, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1982/41] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 21.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE261651 ; | [A]DE247733 ; | [AD]DE679985 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG); | [AD]DE1038211 (GEIGY AG J R) |