EP0062848 - Method and apparatus for the sanification of surface waters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Michael, Dr. Ascholdinger Strasse 17a D-8000 München 71 / DE | 02 /
Blascheck, Reimut Berlinger Weg 30 D-8192 Geretsried / DE | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102778.6 | 01.04.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | DE19813115105 | 14.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3115105 | [1982/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062848 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062848 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C02F7/00 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
C02F1/645 (EP);
C02F3/26 (EP);
C02F7/00 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1982/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sanierung von Oberflächengewässern | [1982/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for the sanification of surface waters | [1982/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de régénération d'eaux de surface | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH324445 [ ] (UNION RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLEN [DE], et al); | DE2650938 [ ] (RIGHETTI GIANMARIA) |