EP0063281 - Device for guiding a pivotable sliding door at a vehicle cab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1986 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1986 [1986/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT Veicoli Industriali S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10100 Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states FIAT Veicoli Industriali S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10100 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giacometti, Giorgio, Dr. Ing. Via Gioyan Battista Corniani 25 I-25100 Brescia / IT | 02 /
Zilioli, Antonio Via Collebeato 33/Q I-25100 Brescia / IT | [1982/43] | Representative(s) | Socha, Peter c/o Eberspächer GmbH & Co, Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Socha, Peter Iveco Magirus AG Postfach 2740 Schillerstrasse 2 D-7900 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1984/30] | Socha, Peter Iveco - Magirus Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 2740 Schillerstrasse 2 D-7900 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1982/43] | Dahmen, Toni Mercedes-Benz AG Patentstrategie D-70332 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102789.3 | 01.04.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | DE19813113311 | 02.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3113311 | [1982/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063281 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063281 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/06, E05D15/10 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
E05D15/1081 (EP);
B60J5/062 (EP);
E05D2015/1055 (EP);
E05D2015/1071 (EP);
E05D2015/1084 (EP);
E05Y2201/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Führung einer Schwenkschiebetür am Fahrerhaus eines Fahrzeuges | [1982/43] | English: | Device for guiding a pivotable sliding door at a vehicle cab | [1982/43] | French: | Dispositif de guidage d'une porte coulissante et pivotante à la cabine d'un véhicule | [1982/43] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 12.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2020576 ; | [A]DE2154426 (KIEKERT SOEHNE ARN); | [A]DE2201622 (BODE & CO VORM WEGMANN & CO) |