EP0063309 - Laser apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.09.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1988 | Revocation of patent | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirokazu, Fukuda 2-7, Matsunouchi 1-chome Akashi-shi Hyogo, 673 / JP | 02 /
Koji, Shinohara 6-28, Suganodai 4-chome Suma-Ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 654 / JP | 03 /
Yoshio, Kawabata 2574-13, Kasugano-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo, 676 / JP | 04 /
Yoshito, Nishijima 4-32, Seiryodai 3-chome Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 655 / JP | 05 /
Kosaku, Yamamoto 10-20, Tamondai 1-chome Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 655 / JP | [1982/43] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/48] | Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 D-8000 München 86 / DE | ||
Former [1982/43] | Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102925.3 | 06.04.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | JP19810054706 | 09.04.1981 Original published format: JP 5470681 | JP19820010556 | 25.01.1982 Original published format: JP 1055682 | [1982/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063309 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063309 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/23, B23K26/02 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
H01S5/4025 (EP,US);
B23K26/042 (EP,US);
H01S5/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/43] | Title | German: | Laservorrichtung | [1982/43] | English: | Laser apparatus | [1982/43] | French: | Dispositif de laser | [1982/43] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/11] | 27.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1986
26.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1986
26.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 30.09.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.06.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1500039 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE); | [Y]US3431513 (NANNICHI YASUO); | [A]FR2197614 (KRASNOV MIKHAIL [SU]) | Opposition | DE1262833 | DE2445966 |