EP0063739 - Method of preparing copper complexes of azo dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1985 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henk, Hermann, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 55 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Schündehütte, Karl Heinz, Dr. Klief 75 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Ditzer, Reiner, Dr. In der Follmühle 21 D-5068 Odenthal 2 / DE | 04 /
Bleck, Wolf Eckhard, Dr. Auf dem Broich 28 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1982/44] | Application number, filing date | 82103110.1 | 13.04.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | DE19813116296 | 24.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3116296 | [1982/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063739 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063739 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09B45/36, C09B62/00 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
C09B62/4416 (EP);
C09B45/36 (EP);
C09B62/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1982/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kupferkomplexazofarbstoffen | [1982/44] | English: | Method of preparing copper complexes of azo dyestuffs | [1982/44] | French: | Un procédé pour la préparation de complexes du cuivre de colorants azoiques | [1982/44] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 04.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2842640 (BAYER AG); | [Y]EP0011873 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]GB2026527 (CIBA GEIGY AG) |