EP0065108 - Thin-walled planting pot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.10.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1989 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELLAPLAST GmbH Karl-Bosch-Strasse 10 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | [1982/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berlit, Horst Mainzer Weg 12 D-6501 Klein-Winternheim / DE | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Seids, Heinrich Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt, Dipl.-Phys. Seids, Dr. Mehler Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Seids, Heinrich, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt, Dipl.-Phys. Seids, Dr. Mehler Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103212.5 | 16.04.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | DE19813119778 | 19.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3119778 | [1982/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065108 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065108 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0065108 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
A01G9/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/47] | Title | German: | Dünnwandiges Pflanzgefäss | [1982/47] | English: | Thin-walled planting pot | [1982/47] | French: | Pot à plantes à paroi mince | [1982/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 24.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.1986
25.11.1986
ADMISSIBLE Kunststoffen Industrie Waalwijk B.V. Altenaweg 12 NL-5145 PC Waalwijk / NL Opponent's representative Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.1986
25.11.1986
ADMISSIBLE Kunststoffen Industrie Waalwijk B.V. Altenaweg 12 NL-5145 PC Waalwijk / NL Opponent's representative Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | 27.11.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.03.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.07.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1897195U (ZUECHNER BLECHWAREN [DE]); | [A]DE1995263U (HERWEG HORST [DE]); | [A]DE2118841 ; | [AD]DE8010117U |