EP0071699 - Secretion collection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermedicat GmbH Gerliswilstrasse 43 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states INTERMEDICAT GMBH Gerliswilstrasse 43 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voges, Karl-Friedrich, Ing. grad. Lindenbergstrasse 18 D-3508 Melsungen / DE | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1983/07] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103396.6 | 22.04.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | DE19813131378 | 07.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3131378 | [1983/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0071699 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0071699 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071699 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
A61F5/4404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Sekretsammelvorrichtung | [1983/07] | English: | Secretion collection device | [1983/07] | French: | Collecteur de sécrétions | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 06.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3312221 (OVERMENT ALFRED P H); | [Y]US3716055 (SCHULTZE W); | [A]FR2156779 (BAXTER LABORATORIES INC); | [A]FR2358608 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]US4192295 (SHERLOCK HUGH P [US]); | [YD]DE2900806 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) |