EP0087495 - Arrangement of valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1986 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kropla, Petrana, Dipl.-Ing. Heckenstrasse 40 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | [1983/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Keil, Rainer A., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN, Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103694.4 | 30.04.1982 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19820004105U | 15.02.1982 Original published format: DE 8204105 U | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087495 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12, F24D19/10 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
F24D19/0012 (EP);
G05D23/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Ventil-Anordnung | [1983/36] | English: | Arrangement of valves | [1983/36] | French: | Arrangement de soupapes | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 10.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1135510 ; | [A]DE1579879 (FALTAY LASZLO EDE JANOS); | [A]US4183722 (ROEDER GEORGE K [US]) |