EP0065209 - Metering method for feeding a concentrated detergent to a washing machine, and apparatus to carry out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1984 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 D-83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [1982/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saalmann, Günter Birkenstrasse 50 D-5820 Gevelsberg / DE | 02 /
Haslberger, Richard Waginger Strasse 18 D-8221 Hallabruck / DE | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Bornemann, Dieter c/o Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien - Patentabteilung - Postfach 1100 Henkelstrasse 67 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Bornemann, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien - Patentabteilung - Postfach 1100 Henkelstrasse 67 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103857.7 | 05.05.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | DE19813118973 | 13.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3118973 | [1982/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065209 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
A47L15/0055 (EP,US);
A47L15/4463 (EP,US);
D06F33/37 (EP,US);
D06F34/22 (EP,US);
A47L15/4436 (EP,US);
A47L2401/30 (EP,US);
A47L2501/07 (EP,US);
D06F2103/22 (EP,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/47] | Title | German: | Dosierverfahren zum Versorgen einer Waschmaschine mit Waschmittelkonzentrat und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [1982/47] | English: | Metering method for feeding a concentrated detergent to a washing machine, and apparatus to carry out this method | [1982/47] | French: | Procédé de dosage pour l'introduction de détergent concentré dans une machine à laver et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [1982/47] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 06.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1984/39] | 21.04.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH210938 (FALLER LEOPOLD [DE]); | [A]US2218698 (KENDALL CLARK); | [Y]US2382648 (MARTIN THOMAS A); | [A]DE894528 (JANSEN ERNST DIPL-ING); | [A]US3095121 (ALFRED DOUTY, et al); | [A]FR1508839 (MAGGI AG); | [AD]DE1542298 (LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH); | [A]GB1317398 (KRAUSE W); | [A]USRE27681E ; | [A]DE2423822 (BUREL SA ETS F); | [A]GB1501432 (GENERALE ENGRAIS SA); | [A]US4076146 (LAUSBERG JOHANNES WILLEBRORDES, et al); | [Y]FR2386966 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB1536237 (NATTRASS P J, et al) |