EP0064743 - Foam compositions for surface application to fibrous substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19899 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCrossin, Edward Gilbert 1320 April Lane Green Bay Wisconsin 54304 / US | [1982/46] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/46] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Patentanwälte, Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103996.3 | 07.05.1982 | [1982/46] | Priority number, date | US19810262864 | 12.05.1981 Original published format: US 262864 | [1982/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064743 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064743 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L93/04, D21D3/00, D21H3/32 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
D21H17/55 (EP,US);
D21H17/56 (EP,US);
D21H17/62 (EP,US);
D21H21/56 (EP,US);
C08J2393/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/46] | Title | German: | Schaumzusammensetzungen zum Auftragen auf Oberflächen von Fasersubstraten | [1982/46] | English: | Foam compositions for surface application to fibrous substrates | [1982/46] | French: | Compositions de mousse pour application superficielle sur des substrats fibreux | [1982/46] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3186900 (DE YOUNG FREDERICK B); | [Y]US3966654 (ALDRICH PAUL H); | [YD]DE2848194 (HERCULES POWDER CO LTD) |