EP0067313 - Smoke detector with a pulse-actuated radiation source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1986 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerberus AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states CERBERUS AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muggli, Jürg, Dr. Dipl.Phys. Biberhaldenweg 19 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | 02 /
Güttinger, Heinz, Dipl. Ing. Obstgartenweg 14 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Tiemann, Ulrich, et al c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Tiemann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | ||
Former [1983/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1982/51] | Tiemann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 82104169.6 | 13.05.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | CH19810003926 | 15.06.1981 Original published format: CH 392681 | [1982/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067313 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067313 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/10 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Rauchdetektor mit einer impulsweise betriebenen Strahlungsquelle | [1982/51] | English: | Smoke detector with a pulse-actuated radiation source | [1982/51] | French: | Détecteur de fumée comportant une source de rayonnement commandée par impulsions | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 27.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1082973 (INT RESEARCH & DEV CO LTD); | [A]US3846773 (LINTELMANN W, et al); | [Y]GB2003601 (NITTAN CO LTD) | [Y] - ELECTRONICS, Band 52, Nr. 14, Juli 1979, Seite 133, New York, USA | Examination | CH417405 | EP0014779 |