EP0068130 - Display system and method of forming displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Vernon David One Hobby Drive Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Gasslander, Sten, et al IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | Gasslander, Sten, et al IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1983/21] | Gasslander, Sten IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1983/01] | Petersen, Richard Courtenay IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants. SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82104237.1 | 14.05.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | US19810279280 | 30.06.1981 Original published format: US 279280 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068130 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068130 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068130 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/56 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
H01J29/56 (EP,US);
H01J31/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bildwiedergabe | [1983/01] | English: | Display system and method of forming displays | [1983/01] | French: | Dispositif de visualisation et méthode d'obtention de l'affichage | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.10.1986 | CH | 31.05.1987 | LI | 31.05.1987 | [1997/17] |
Former [1989/24] | BE | 08.10.1986 | |
CH | 31.05.1987 | ||
LI | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 08.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3421044 (MURDOCK CLAYTON E, et al); | [A]FR1573580 ; | [A]US3551734 (O'KEEFFE TERENCE W, et al); | [A]AU477865B ; | [A]US4099092 (BRISTOW STEPHEN D) |