EP0065725 - Composition and method to combat blue algae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juettner, Friedrich, Dr. Hausserstrasse 140 D-7400 Tuebingen / DE | [1982/48] | Application number, filing date | 82104262.9 | 15.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | DE19813120805 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3120805 | [1982/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065725 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01N49/00 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
A01N49/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/48] | Title | German: | Mittel und Verfahren zur Bekämpfung von Blaualgen | [1982/48] | English: | Composition and method to combat blue algae | [1982/48] | French: | Composition et procédé pour combattre les algues bleues | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.08.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/06] | 06.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1567819 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]GB989554 (PETER SCHMIALEK); | [YP]JPS5673005 | [YP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 140(C-70)(812), 4. September 1981& JP - A - 56 73005 (KURARAY) 17-06-1981 |