EP0068132 - Impact-resistant thermoplastic moulding masses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1983 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandstetter, Franz, Dr. Ritterbuechel 45 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Hambrecht, Juergen, Dr. Werderstrasse 30 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Reimann, Horst, Dr. Adelheidstrasse 26 D-6520 Worms / DE | 04 /
Pflueger, Richard Am Weidenschlag 20 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Ruppmich, Karl Koenigsbacher Strasse 134 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1983/01] | Application number, filing date | 82104263.7 | 15.05.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | DE19813120803 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3120803 | [1983/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068132 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068132 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L51/00, C08L55/02, C08L25/12 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/00, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/24 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/01] | Title | German: | Schlagzähe thermoplastische Formmassen | [1983/01] | English: | Impact-resistant thermoplastic moulding masses | [1983/01] | French: | Masses à mouler thermoplastiques résistantes aux chocs | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 20.08.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2259136 ; | [A]US3134746 ; | [A]FR2279817 ; | [A]JPS5411159 ; | [A]JPS5463149 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 90, 1979, Seite 71, Nr. 188319w, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 79 11159 (TORAY INDUSTRIESINC.) 27.01.1979 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 87(C53), 25. Juli 1979Seite 54C53 & JP - A - 54 63149 (SUMITOMO NAUGATUCK K.K.) 21.05.1979 |