EP0067962 - Multiple door closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kühl Bauelemente GmbH Rensingstrasse 5-9 D-4630 Bochum / DE | [1982/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlösser, Helmut Heimannstrasse 48 D-4250 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Kühl, Dieter Nevelstrasse 27 b D-4630 Bochum / DE | [1982/52] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/52] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104268.6 | 15.05.1982 | [1982/52] | Priority number, date | DE19813124787 | 24.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3124787 | [1982/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067962 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E05B63/12, E05C21/00 | [1982/52] | CPC: |
E05B63/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/52] | Title | German: | Mehrfachtürverriegelung | [1982/52] | English: | Multiple door closure | [1982/52] | French: | Verrouillage multiple de porte | [1982/52] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE42475 ; | [A]US1585089 |