EP0067972 - Wavelength multiplexer/demultiplexer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/52] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillerich, Bernd, Dipl.-Phys. Haldenweg 2 D-7906 Blaustein / DE | [1982/52] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1982/52] | Schickle, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 70 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104613.3 | 27.05.1982 | [1982/52] | Priority number, date | DE19813122781 | 09.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122781 | [1982/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067972 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/26, G02B5/176 | [1982/52] | CPC: |
G02B6/29328 (EP);
G02B6/2938 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/52] | Title | German: | Wellenlängenmultiplexer bzw. Wellenlängendemultiplexer | [1982/52] | English: | Wavelength multiplexer/demultiplexer | [1982/52] | French: | Multiplexeur/démultiplexeur de longeurs d'onde | [1982/52] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 19.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55126831 ; | [A]DE2454996 ; | [A]EP0037787 ; | [A]US4274706 ; | [A]US4111524 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 184, 18. Dezember 1980, Seite 74P41 & JP - A - 55 126 831 (RITSUO HASUMI) 10-01-1980, & JP55126831 A 00000000 |