EP0066825 - Rubber sleeve for a wide band clip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rasmussen GmbH Edisonstrasse 4 63477 Maintal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states Rasmussen GmbH Edisonstrasse 4 D-63477 Maintal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löhr, Robert Freihofstrasse 8 D-6453 Seligenstadt / DE | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104758.6 | 29.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | DE19813122708 | 06.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122708 | [1982/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066825 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066825 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/00, F16L17/00 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
F16L21/005 (EP);
F16L17/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/50] | F16L21/00, F16L17/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/50] | Title | German: | Gummimuffe für eine Breitbandschelle | [1982/50] | English: | Rubber sleeve for a wide band clip | [1982/50] | French: | Manchon en caoutchouc pour un collier de serrage large | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3430989 ; | [Y]FR2072809 ; | [A]FR2343958 ; | [A]FR2237111 ; | [A]CH432956 ; | [A]GB995409 ; | [A]GB1060504 | Examination | DE2834009 |