EP0066287 - Complex transition metal compounds and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1987 [1987/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Günter, Prof. Dr. Laakmannsbusch 38 D-5620 Velbert 11 (Langenberg) / DE | [1982/49] | Application number, filing date | 82104779.2 | 01.06.1982 | [1982/49] | Priority number, date | DE19813121927 | 03.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3121927 | [1982/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0066287 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0066287 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066287 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C01G1/00, C01G1/06, C07C9/02, C07C5/00, C07C45/00 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
C07F15/065 (EP,US);
C01G1/00 (EP,US);
C01G1/06 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C5/03 (EP,US);
C07C5/09 (EP,US);
C07F15/0013 (EP,US);
C07F15/045 (EP,US);
C07F9/5045 (EP,US);
C07C2531/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/50, C07C47/30 (US,EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/32 (EP,US);
C07C5/03, C07C9/14 (US,EP);
C07C5/03, C07C9/15 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/49] | Title | German: | Übergangsmetall-Komplexverbindungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/49] | English: | Complex transition metal compounds and their preparation | [1982/49] | French: | Composés complexes de métaux de transition et procédé de préparation | [1982/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 11.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2216228 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT]); | [A]US3933919 (WILKINSON GEOFFREY) | [XP] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, 114. Jahrgang, Heft 11, 3. November 1981, Seiten 3634-3642, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE. G SCHMID: "Au55[P(C6H5)3]12C16 - ein Goldcluster ungewöhnlicher Grösse". |