EP0067389 - Safety belt guide structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1986 [1986/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagashima, Hideyuki c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Tsurumi Plant 6-1, Daikoku-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokoham-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Okuyama, Hiro c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Tsurumi Plant 6-1, Daikoku-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokoham-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104941.8 | 04.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | JP19810085475U | 12.06.1981 Original published format: JP 8547581 U | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067389 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067389 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/00 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B60R22/023 (EP,US);
B60R2022/1818 (EP,US);
B60R22/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/51] | B60R21/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/51] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurt-Führungsanordnung | [1985/49] | English: | Safety belt guide structure | [1982/51] | French: | Structure de guide pour ceinture de sécurité | [1982/51] |
Former [1982/51] | Sicherheitsgurt-Führungbau | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 19.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2260569 ; | [A]DE2330210 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]US3244452 (VELEY RONALD A, et al); | [A]US4083602 (MORI MAMORU, et al) |