EP0067394 - Aqueous cholesterol standard solution and method of preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deeg, Rolf, Dr. rer. nat. Seeseitener Strasse 18 D-8124 Seeshaupt / DE | 02 /
Dengler, Gisela Alpspitzstrasse 1 D-8121 Wielenbach / DE | 03 /
Ziegenhorn, Joachim, Dr. rer. nat. Ina-Seidel-Weg 1 D-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1982/51] | Application number, filing date | 82104965.7 | 07.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | DE19813122917 | 10.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122917 | [1982/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067394 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067394 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/60, G01N33/92 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
C12Q1/60 (EP,US);
Y10T436/104165 (EP,US);
Y10T436/108331 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Wässrige Cholesterin-Standardlösung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/51] | English: | Aqueous cholesterol standard solution and method of preparing the same | [1982/51] | French: | Solution étalon aqueuse de cholestérol et son procédé de préparation | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2324386 ; | [A]US4189400 (BONDERMAN DEAN P [US], et al); | [AD]DE2839433 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) | [AD] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, Band 25, Nr. 1, 1979, Easton, J. ABELE et al.: "Aqueous Primary Standard for Use in Measuring Cholesterol by the Cholesterol Oxidase Method" Seiten 132 bis 135 |