EP0067441 - Hysteresis circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusakabe, Hiromi 407 Myorenji-corporus 454-4, Nishiooguchi Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Yoshihiro 618 Toshiba-Hiyoshi-ryo 1020 Hiyoshihoncho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105201.6 | 14.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | JP19810091987 | 15.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9198781 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0067441 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0067441 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067441 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/295 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
H03K3/2897 (EP,US);
H03K3/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/51] | Title | German: | Hysterese-Schaltung | [1982/51] | English: | Hysteresis circuit | [1982/51] | French: | Circuit à hystérésis | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2155355 (SOLARTRON ELECTRONIC GROUP); | [A]US3623147 (SCHEERER RONALD C, et al); | [A]DE2123195 (ELEKTRO APP WERKE VEB); | [A]LU57469 | [A] - THE GENERAL RADIO EXPERIMENTER, vol. 42, no. 11, November/December 1968, pages 13-16, Concord, USA; J.K. SKILLING: "Novel voltage-variable Schmitt circuit" |