EP0070405 - Accelerator for control valves, especially for triple pressure control valves for train air brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1983/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Johann Ohlmüllerstrasse 14 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1983/04] | Application number, filing date | 82105535.7 | 24.06.1982 | [1983/04] | Priority number, date | DE19813127774 | 14.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3127774 | [1983/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070405 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070405 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60T15/42 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
B60T15/18 (EP,US);
B60T15/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/04] | Title | German: | Beschleuniger für Steuerventile, insbesondere Dreidrucksteuerventile von Schienenfahrzeug-Druckluftbremsanlagen | [1984/42] | English: | Accelerator for control valves, especially for triple pressure control valves for train air brakes | [1983/04] | French: | Accélérateur pour valves-pilotes, particulièrement pour valves pilotes triples de freins à air comprimé pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1983/04] |
Former [1983/04] | Beschleuniger für Steuerventile, insbesondere Dreidrucksteuerventile von Schienenfahrzeug-Druckluftbremsanlgen | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 22.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE967165 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [AD]DE969085 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [A]DE1236551 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [A]DE1276681 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [A]DE2165144 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2165092 ; | [A]US4026609 (BRIDIGUM ROBERT J); | [AD]US4073544 (HART JAMES E); | [AD]DE2651377 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [AD]US4145090 (HART JAMES E); | [AD]FR2411740 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]); | [A]US4175792 (HART JAMES E [US]); | [A]EP0017260 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]); | [AD]WO8101393 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE], et al) | Examination | WO0100393 |