EP0080015 - A boot with bootlace fastening means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/22] | A bootlace fastening means | ||
[1987/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ahn, Yu Ho 481, Hyomock-dong Dong-ku Taegu-shi / KR | For all designated states Hong, Won Bae 715-10, Daebong-dong Choong-ku Taegu-shi / KR | For all designated states Hur, Young Tae 538-7, Daemyung-dong Nam-ku Taegu-shi / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states Ahn, Yu Ho 481, Hyomock-dong Dong-ku Taegu-shi / KR | ||
For all designated states Hong, Won Bae 715-10, Daebong-dong Choong-ku Taegu-shi / KR | |||
For all designated states Hur, Young Tae 538-7, Daemyung-dong Nam-ku Taegu-shi / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/03] |
Former [1983/22] | 01 /
Ahn, Yu Ho 481, Hyomock-dong Dong-ku Taegu-shi / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105646.2 | 25.06.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | KR19780007381U | 20.11.1981 Original published format: KR 787381 U | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080015 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080015 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080015 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A43C1/06 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
A43C1/00 (EP,US);
A43C5/00 (KR);
A43B3/02 (KR);
A43C1/06 (KR);
Y10T24/3737 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/22] | Title | German: | Schuh mit Schnürverschluss | [1987/26] | English: | A boot with bootlace fastening means | [1987/26] | French: | Chaussure avec fermeture à lacets | [1987/26] |
Former [1983/22] | Schnürverschluss für Schuhe | ||
Former [1983/22] | A bootlace fastening means | ||
Former [1983/22] | Fermeture de chaussure à lacets | Examination procedure | 22.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.06.1987 | LI | 24.06.1987 | NL | 24.06.1987 | LU | 30.06.1987 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/24] | CH | 24.06.1987 | |
LI | 24.06.1987 | ||
NL | 24.06.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | NL | 24.06.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1474396 (WILLIAM ZAPIS); | [A]GB366177 (MOBBS BROTHERS EMBEKAY LTD, et al); | [A]FR788872 (R & L WEYL ET CIE) |