EP0070011 - Electroplating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1985 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Vries, Hans Zuppeldseweg 15 NL-8181 NG Heerde / NL | 02 /
Birkle, Siegfried, Dr. Veit-Stoss-Strasse 46 D-8552 Höchstadt/Aisch / DE | 03 /
Stöger, Klaus Benekestrasse 40 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
Gehring, Johann Hohe Warte 2 D-8521 Spardorf / DE | [1983/03] | Application number, filing date | 82106169.4 | 09.07.1982 | [1983/03] | Priority number, date | DE19813127390 | 10.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3127390 | [1983/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070011 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070011 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/20 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
C25D17/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/03] | Title | German: | Galvanisiereinrichtung | [1983/03] | English: | Electroplating apparatus | [1983/03] | French: | Dispositif de galvanisation | [1983/03] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2353592 [ ]; | DE2524315 [ ] (MONROE BELGIUM NV); | DE2538674 [ ]; | DE2728366 [ ] (TRW INC); | US4105526 [ ] (LEWELLEN JR WENDELL G, et al) |