EP0071079 - Process for the preparation of 2-trimethylsilyloxyethyl amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1986 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Findeisen, Kurt, Dr. In der Follmuehle 10 D-5068 Odenthal 2 / DE | 02 /
Ziemann, Heinz, Dr. Am Wiesenberg 10 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | [1983/06] | Application number, filing date | 82106282.5 | 14.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | DE19813129272 | 24.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3129272 | [1983/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071079 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071079 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, // C08K5/54 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Trimethylsilyloxy-ethylaminen | [1983/06] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-trimethylsilyloxyethyl amines | [1983/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 2 triméthylsilyloxyéthylamines | [1983/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 14.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2722118 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]DE1157228 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) | [A] - COMPTES RENDUS HEBDOMADAIRES DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, Band 265, Nr. 9, Serie C, 28. August 1967, Seiten 516-518 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 71, Nr. 11, 15. September 1969, page 411, no. 50058m, Columbus, Ohio, USA | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 25, Nr. 9, 7. September 1960, Seiten 1658-1660, The American Chemical Society | [AD] - EUGEN MÜLLER: "Methoden der organischen Chemie", Band XI/1, Seiten 571-574, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE. |